Trustees CROYDON HARRIERS (ATHLETICS CLUB)
Charity number: 1125648

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN OXLADE | Chair | 24 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Karen Stewart | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
PEARL SETHNA-McINTOSH | Trustee | 18 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
JAMES MOORE | Trustee | 19 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
RADHIKA SHANMUGANATHAN | Trustee | 19 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN WHITE | Trustee | 10 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANDY JOHN DEL NEVO | Trustee | 10 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
NEIL AIKMAN | Trustee | 10 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW KIERNAN | Trustee | 24 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Amy STONE | Trustee | 24 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
PAUL BRYAN WESTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL ANTHONY FLEET | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TERRY DEAN LAPINS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.