Financial history HELPING THE BURMESE DELTA

Charity number: 1124774
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £31.67k £42.92k £35.19k £15.13k £25.38k
Total expenditure £55.87k £36.82k £3.10k £35.34k £20.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A