Financial history EUROPA NOSTRA UK

Charity Number: 1127041
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £1.24k £0 £2.56k £163 £5.15k
Total expenditure £1.75k £261 £496 £1.13k £2.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A