Trustees THE RAINBOW CENTRE (MARHAM)
Charity number: 1126581

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Andrew Hitchen | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Margaret Isabelle Hall | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Mclean | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Wigglesworth | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maximillian Richard Charles Alan Hayward | Trustee | 14 January 2018 |
|
|||||
Gary James Walker MBE TD VR | Trustee | 10 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
DORA MASAUDA GENT | Trustee | 29 April 2008 |
|
|
||||
DAVID SMITH BSC RAF | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.