Accounts and annual returns CANTERBURY DISTRICT VOLUNTARY ACTION AND SUPPORT

Charity number: 1125359
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2012 28 March 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2011 02 December 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2011 23 December 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 May 2010 16 December 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2010 15 December 2010 On Time