Financial history UK FRIENDS OF THE MUSTIQUE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1125777
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £65.94k £1.32m £67.13k £183.81k £694.72k
Total expenditure £139.40k £278.56k £1.52m £56.28k £69.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £1.32m N/A N/A £332.72k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 N/A N/A £9.65k
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A £352.35k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £272.24k N/A N/A £69.51k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £6.32k N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £3.00k N/A N/A £180
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £232.02k N/A N/A £27.82k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A £0