Financial history FREEDOM COMMUNITY ALLIANCE LIMITED

Charity Number: 1125960
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £841.29k £822.45k £951.38k £1.25m £1.06m
Total expenditure £744.10k £830.76k £932.95k £1.03m £1.03m
Income from government contracts £110.55k £113.49k £171.19k £146.84k £226.43k
Income from government grants N/A £50.00k £125.59k £264.27k £66.35k
Income - Donations and legacies £155.69k £108.68k £186.11k £427.49k £333.58k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £644.68k £686.73k £733.67k £751.09k £684.86k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £43 £8 £10 £578 £2.83k
Income - Other £40.88k £27.05k £31.59k £72.77k £36.99k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.53k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £744.10k £830.76k £932.95k £1.02m £1.01m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £13.57k £11.53k
Expenditure - Governance £432 £441 £502 £7.75k £8.48k
Expenditure - Grants institution £780 £660 £720 £920 £4.12k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0