MAC-UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Engage excluded young people and the networks around them in meaningful activity to promote wellbeing, employability, health, positive relationships and opportunities for life by providing services with young people , so that the most excluded access psychological support and building learning partnerships to improve services for excluded young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 02 October 2008: Standard registration
- MA (Previous name)
- MUSIC AND CHANGE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paula Harriott | Chair | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Yeates | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Edward Baker | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Immanuelle Agyare | Trustee | 03 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Peters | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sodolamu Oluwatosin Sowemimo | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Julia Mansi | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ama Afrifa-Tchie | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keisha Nicole Swaby | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £653.61k | £405.46k | £472.37k | £285.59k | £334.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £718.43k | £596.35k | £425.34k | £418.86k | £404.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £258.39k | £225.17k | £188.66k | £51.56k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £30.10k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £371.97k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £882 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £250.66k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £708.44k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £12.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 20 August 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 20 August 2024 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 22 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 22 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 SEPTEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 MAY 2017 as amended on 26 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH; A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. C) RAISING AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES AFFECTING EXCLUDED YOUNG PEOPLE BY WORKING WITH THE SYSTEMS AROUND YOUNG PEOPLE FOR THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG OF YOUNG PEOPLE. TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 30 YEARS LIVING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL EDUCATION AN OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF; A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE FINSBURY BUSINESS CENTRE LTD
40 BOWLING GREEN LANE
LONDON
EC1R 0NE
- Phone:
- 07725555295
- Email:
- info@mac-uk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window