AFRICAN RAINFOREST TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(I) TO PROMOTE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE RAINFORESTS OF AFRICA. (II) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF COMMUNITIES SURROUNDING OR INHABITING THE RAINFORESTS OF AFRICA. (III) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF AFRICAN RAINFORESTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kenya
- Tanzania
- Uganda
Governance
- 14 May 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Josephine Lindop | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carl Axel Linderum | Trustee | 29 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Guy Roland Purcell | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
FINLEY CARTER COLEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULES ANSELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.61k | £15.36k | £26.69k | £1.03k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.04k | £15.33k | £26.68k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE RAINFORESTS OF AFRICA. (II) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF COMMUNITIES SURROUNDING OR INHABITING THE RAINFORESTS OF AFRICA. (III) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF AFRICAN RAINFORESTS.
Area of benefit
AFRICA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 Kensington Court, Flat 1
LONDON
W8 5DB
- Phone:
- 07528519045
- Email:
- carter@africanrainforest.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window