DOLCORSLLWYN HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity owns a large mansion in mid Wales which it maintains and refurbishes as funds allow so to provide residential experience for children or young people, especially those from a needy or under privileged background.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
Governance
- 11 September 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR BOB DOWNING | Chair |
|
|
|||||
John Curran | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Keith Owen | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN DOWNING | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|||||
Anna Routledge | Trustee | 10 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW NOLAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL ROUTLEDGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.94k | £14.19k | £27.19k | £13.07k | £13.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.79k | £14.47k | £24.21k | £17.43k | £11.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 23 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 08 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 20 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 AUGUST 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, ADAPT AND MAINTAIN THE PROPERTY KNOWN AS DOLCORSLLWYN HALL IN CEMMAES, POWYS SY20 9AB WITH THE OBJECT OF PROVIDING RESIDENTIAL FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, BEING FACILITIES; A) OF WHICH SUCH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE HAVE NEED, BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. B) WHICH WILL HELP TO IMPROVE THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR SUCH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROMOTING THEIR PHYSICAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL BEING.
Area of benefit
POWYS
Contact information
- Address:
-
74 DELPH PARK AVENUE
AUGHTON
ORMSKIRK
L39 5DQ
- Phone:
- 01695422642
- Email:
- bobdowning01@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window