Financial history THE LATIN PROGRAMME-VIA FACILIS

Charity number: 1126564
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £164.79k £57.19k £156.28k £199.67k £132.88k
Total expenditure £169.93k £111.72k £181.61k £172.64k £164.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.60k £9.19k N/A N/A