UMAR WELFARE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
-Promote, preservation & protection of good health amongst people in need in Pakistan -Provision of a clinic for the benefit of the general public -Provide information, advice, equipment (where possible) and other such goods & services when needed to relieve such needs -Provide necessary supplies for food banks -Build a hospital in Pakistan to address health issues -Provide vocational skills
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Pakistan
Governance
- 13 October 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EJAZ HUSSAIN KHALID | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Shenila Javed | Trustee | 27 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANEEL MUSSARAT | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|||||
CAROL ALLEN | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|||||
RIZWAN KHALID | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.29k | £53.26k | £20.63k | £33.35k | £25.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.08k | £61.59k | £18.48k | £43.53k | £12.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 7 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE IN NEED IN PAKISTAN BY THE PROVISION OF A CLINIC FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, INFORMATION, ADVICE, EQUIPMENT AND OTHER GOODS AND SERVICES CALCULATED TO RELIEVE SUCH NEEDS. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN PAKISTAN BY THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL AND SKILLS TRAINING FOR ADULTS WHO BY REASON OF THEIR HEALTH OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES ARE UNABLE TO GAIN EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
PAKISTAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
UMAR WELFARE SOCIETY
53 Knowsley Street
MANCHESTER
M8 8JF
- Phone:
- 0161 832 6285
- Email:
- rizkhalid@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window