Financial history GOOD NEIGHBOUR PROJECT

Charity Number: 1126344
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £78.32k £47.70k £6.37k £5.17k £868
Total expenditure £90.82k £59.14k £24.85k £30.01k £3.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £41.94k £36.19k N/A N/A N/A