FRIENDS OF THE MOOT HALL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1127073
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the education of the general public in the subject of the historical and cultural importance of the Moot Hall, Maldon

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £21,960
Total expenditure: £19,566

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 December 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DR RICHARD WOOLDRIDGE Chair 11 March 2011
COMBINED MILITARY SERVICES MUSEUM
Received: On time
THE COMBINED MILITARY SERVICES COLLECTION
Received: On time
COMBINED MILITARY SERVICES MUSEUM
Received: On time
John Lynn Trustee 10 January 2020
None on record
Theresa Elizabeth Ann Byles Trustee 13 February 2018
DANBURY VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
MALDON AND DISTRICT UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Received: On time
Michael Charles Bentley Trustee 10 March 2015
None on record
MRS J MILLER Trustee 14 July 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £20.83k £31.18k £20.72k £24.33k £21.96k
Total expenditure £17.84k £23.13k £14.88k £33.49k £19.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 06 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 28 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 14 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 16 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 09 January 2023 163 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 23 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Moot Hall
High Street
MALDON
Essex
CM9 5PF
Phone:
01621851553