OVERSEAS FELLOWSHIP OF NIGERIAN CHRISTIANS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of the Christian faith through prayers, worship, Bible study, talks, fellowship for all, and making humanitarian contributions towards the relief of pain and suffering in persons going through conditions of need, hardship and distress. Members, young and old, are to play active and constructive roles in their local churches and communities, and in the development of the country.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

39 Trustee(s)
224 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Nigeria
Governance
- 18 November 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
39 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aderonke Williams | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ngozi Nwokoma | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pius Oboh | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
ADEBOWALE SOKOYA | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Toluwani Daramola | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Frederick Jackson Oboloje | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
dr Ayuba Lawan | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Ikuobase | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Olutola Awosemo | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Olagoke Faromika | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Aguana | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Antonio Tembo | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ekenyem Onyebuenyi | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ayodele Mustapha | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Hamza | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gbenga Popoola | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Ugwueze | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Nwakunor | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Ameobi | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Olumide Joseph Ologan | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yetunde Adebisi | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chima Mere | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oluwakemi Morohunkeji Ajayi | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chinyere Erharuyi | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Justin Ushie | Trustee | 27 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ayodeji Rotibi | Trustee | 30 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Abel Adegoke | Trustee | 30 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Inyang | Trustee | 30 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Oluwagbeminiyi Olusola | Trustee | 26 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Titilayo Oluwatudimu | Trustee | 26 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Dianabasi Nkantah | Trustee | 26 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Glory Vincent-Hejirika | Trustee | 26 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Prof John Durodola | Trustee | 26 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Akintoye Oluwatudimu | Trustee | 26 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Olufunmilayo Mosadoluwa Bafuwa | Trustee | 26 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kayode Adisa | Trustee | 26 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ademola Akomolafe | Trustee | 26 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr BABATUNJI ADEOGUN | Trustee | 23 August 2015 |
|
|||||
Dr Ifeoluwa Akintunde | Trustee | 27 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £398.91k | £232.26k | £223.53k | £362.84k | £415.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £402.01k | £142.44k | £129.58k | £314.79k | £416.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, AND TO ADVANCE THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP, AND DISTRESS TO ADVANCE THE CHARITIES OBJECTS BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION FOR ENGLAND AND WALES
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATION AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
TOP HOUSE
SHAWHEATH CLOSE
MANCHESTER
M15 4BQ
- Phone:
- 02070975153
- Email:
- info@ofnc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window