FUSION YOUTH PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of recreational and leisure time activities for local young people, provided in the interest of social welfare, designed to improve their conditions of life;promote good health and self esteem. These include an open youth group, a 'transitional' group for young women, mentoring, young women's work, schools work, residentials.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2018
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 23 July 2009: Standard registration
- FUSION (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER HAZELEY-JONES | Trustee |
|
||||||
VALERIE JOY KARLENE DANIEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALISON MAY ROSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HEATHER CARTY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ROY TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2014 | 01/01/2015 | 01/01/2016 | 01/01/2017 | 01/01/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 554 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 554 days | |
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 919 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 919 days | |
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1284 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1284 days | |
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1649 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1649 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 SEPTEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES ONLY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 21 LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AS UNDERSTOOD BY THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE FOLLOWING: THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION AND SELF ESTEEM OF THE YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
101 HAMSTEAD HALL ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B20 1JA
- Phone:
- 01215511336
- Email:
- roytaylor695@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window