Financial history THE PELARGONIUM AND GERANIUM SOCIETY

Charity number: 1127032
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £9.37k £6.72k £7.51k £7.13k £8.02k
Total expenditure £7.55k £8.54k £7.62k £7.37k £5.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A