SITA CORNWALL TRUST LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The mission of SITA Cornwall Trust is to award and distribute funds generated through the landfill Communities Fund to projects that will provide essential social and environmental benefit to communities throughout Cornwall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cornwall
Governance
- 29 December 2008: Standard registration
- 09 February 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 30/09/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £981.06k | £1.08m | £553.07k | £131.66k | £642 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.22m | £1.15m | £799.00k | £684.63k | £449.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £978.08k | £1.08m | £552.09k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.98k | £1.63k | £985 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.22m | £1.15m | £799.02k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.84k | £3.23k | £3.40k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £1.08m | £736.43k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 23 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 23 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 21 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 21 November 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 SEPTEMBER 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 19 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
"3. THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY A) THE RECLAMATION, REMEDIATION OR RESTORATION OF ANY LAND THE USE OF WHICH FOR ANY ECONOMIC, SOCIAL OR ENVIRONMENTAL PURPOSE HAS BEEN PREVENTED OR RESTRICTED BECAUSE OF THE CARRYING ON OF AN ACTIVITY ON THE LAND WHICH HAS CEASED. (B) (I) PREVENTING OR REDUCING ANY POTENTIAL FOR POLLUTION, OR (I) REMEDYING OR MITIGATING THE EFFECTS OF ANY POLLUTION THAT HAS BEEN CAUSED, IN RELATION TO ANY LAND THE CONDITION OF WHICH, BY REASON OF THE CARRYING ON OF AN ACTIVITY ON THE LAND WHICH HAS CEASED, IS SUCH THAT POLLUTION (WHETHER ABOVE LAND OR NOT) IS BEING OR MAY BE CAUSED AS A RESULT OF THE ACTIVITY PREVIOUSLY CARRIED OUT ON THE LAND. (C) PROMOTING SUSTAINABLE WASTE MANAGEMENT PRACTICES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BEST PRACTICABLE ENVIRONMENTAL OPTION BY: (I) RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, OR (II) EDUCATION, OR (III) THE COLLECTION AND DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION ABOUT WASTE MANAGEMENT PRACTICES GENERALLY. : IN THIS CLAUSE SUSTAINABLE WASTE MANAGEMENT PRACTICES INCLUDE WASTE . MINIMISATION, MINIMISATION OF POLLUTION AND HARM FROM WASTE, REUSE RECYCLING OF WASTE, WASTE RECOVERY ACTIVITIES AND CLEARING OF POLLUTANTS CONTAMINATED LAND AND BEST PRACTICAL ENVIRONMENTAL OPTION SHALL HAVE MEANING GIVEN TO IT IN THE WHILE PAPER 'WASTE STRATEGY 2000 FOR ENGLAND AND WALES. (D) WHERE IT IS FOR THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT, CARRYING OUT THE PROVISION MAINTENANCE OR IMPROVEMENT OF:- (I) A PUBLIC PARK, (II) ANY OTHER PUBLIC AMENITY, WHICH IN EITHER CASE IS IN THE VICINITY OF A LANDFILL SITE AND PROVIDED THE CONDITIONS SET OUT IN PARAGRAPH (6) OF REGULATION 33 OF THE REGULATIONS IS MET. (E) WHERE IT IS FOR THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT, CARRYING OUT THE MAINTENANCE, REPAIR OR RESTORATION OF A BUILDING OR OTHER STRUCTURE WHICH: (I) IS A PLACE OF RELIGIOUS WORSHIP OR OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST, AND (II) IS OPEN TO THE PUBLIC, AND (I1I) IS SITUATED IN THE VICINITY OF A LANDFILL SITE,
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, CORNWALL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window