Financial history SIDNEY WEST CENTRE CHARITY

Charity Number: 1129153
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £49.97k £55.21k £45.93k £44.92k £53.44k
Total expenditure £44.89k £34.90k £43.42k £52.41k £60.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A