Governing document KIRIMA LIMITED

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/10/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/01/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/04/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/12/2013 as amended on 06 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT KIRIMA PARENTS PRIMARY SCHOOL, GREAT LAKES HIGH SCHOOL, GREAT LAKES REGIONAL COLLEGE, NYAMIRAMA PARENTS PRIMARY SCHOOL, RUTENGA PARENTS PRIMARY SCHOOL, NYAKABUNGO PARENTS PRIMARY SCHOOL AND THE GREAT STEWARDS OF HOPE EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS 2 THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF PUBLIC HEALTH
Area of benefit
KIRIMA PARENTS PRIMARY SCHOOL, GREAT LAKES COLLEGE, GREAT LAKES HIGH SCHOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.