Financial history CARETRADE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1127890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £681.75k £1.29m £1.17m £1.29m £1.41m
Total expenditure £545.56k £1.15m £1.01m £1.29m £1.47m
Income from government contracts £653.29k £1.09m £928.98k £1.12m £1.25m
Income from government grants £9.38k £110.57k £39.48k £39.01k £29.89k
Income - Donations and legacies £14.02k £185.50k £206.13k £134.62k £121.53k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £667.71k £1.10m £959.51k £1.15m £1.28m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £16 £2.41k £2.40k £6.94k £7.75k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £540.18k £1.10m £980.38k £1.25m £1.47m
Expenditure - Raising funds £5.38k £51.43k £29.97k £36.79k £8.88k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £5.95k £6.13k £6.97k £7.35k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £16.00k £13.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0