THE FRIENDS OF CZECH HERITAGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raises funds by holding lectures and visits and approaching grant giving bodies and individuals to assist in restoration and enhancement of the cultural heritage in buildings, gardens and parks and their contents and in objects of historic, scientific, aesthetic or social value in the Czech Republic.Organises working holidays for volunteers to assist in restoring heritage sites.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- Czech Republic
Governance
- 05 February 2009: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF CZECH HISTORIC BUILDINGS, GARDENS AND PARKS (Previous name)
- THE UK FRIENDS OF CZECH HISTORIC BUILDINGS (Previous name)
- THE UK FRIENDS OF CZECH HISTORIC BUILDINGS, GARDENS AND PARKS (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER CAMERON JAMIESON | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
DAVID GEORGE CHICK | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
BARBARA PEACOCK | Trustee | 17 February 2016 |
|
|
||||||
JAMES ANDREW STUART ROBERTSON | Trustee | 11 March 2013 |
|
|
||||||
CHARLES WAINWRIGHT THOMSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.21k | £4.80k | £7.05k | £8.43k | £15.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.63k | £8.60k | £12.93k | £8.05k | £10.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26/11/2008 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 02/03/2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 25/06/2013
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE PRESERVATION AND RESTORATION OF BUILDINGS, GARDENS, PARKS AND OTHER SITES (INCLUDING THEIR CONTENTS) OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE IN THE CZECH REPUBLIC FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AT LARGE
Area of benefit
CZECH REPUBLIC
Contact information
- Address:
-
Corvara
Church Lane
Ripe
LEWES
East Sussex
BN8 6AT
- Phone:
- 01323811456
- Email:
- info@czechfriends.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window