Financial history IRONBRIDGE RAILWAY TRUST

Charity number: 1129939
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £989 £809 £600 £470 £430
Total expenditure £1.44k £307 £310 £299 £4.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A