FAMILIES NEED FATHERS BOTH PARENTS MATTER CYMRU

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the relief of parents and their children and other close family members living in Wales and suffering from the consequences of divorce or separation by providing advice, assistance and other support and, in so doing, helping parents stay in touch with their children after divorce or separation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 09 March 2010: Standard registration
- FAMILIES NEED FATHERS CYMRU (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharmaine Kiddy | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARK ALLAN ISHERWOOD | Trustee | 17 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
AMIN KIDDY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.46k | £67.66k | £78.71k | £96.44k | £90.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.32k | £44.94k | £68.72k | £85.94k | £89.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £26.85k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 February 2025 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 February 2025 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27/09/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06/10/2011 as amended on 04 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
[1] To alleviate distress, suffering and need as a consequence of divorce, family breakdown or separation by providing services to help maintain relationships between children, their parents and wider family, predominantly, but not exclusively, in Wales. [2] To alleviate distress, suffering and need caused by exposure to domestic abuse in any form by providing services to men, predominantly, but not exclusively, in Wales. [3] To advance the development of children by promoting the benefits of shared parenting and meaningful post-separation relationships with both parents. [4] To conduct, disseminate and promote research regarding divorce, family breakdown and separation. In furthering these Objects, we will observe the principles of the United Nations Convention on the Rights of the Child.
Area of benefit
WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
FNF BOTH PARENTS MATTER CYMRU
61 COWBRIDGE ROAD EAST
CARDIFF
CF11 9AE
- Phone:
- 07967463153
- Email:
- INFO@FNF-BPM.ORG.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window