Financial history THE MISS BERYL BILLINGS (KNOWN AS MARGOT BOYD) CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1131146
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £110.74k £183.79k £110.74k £56.43k £111.93k
Total expenditure £70.33k £72.31k £70.33k £25.76k £115.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A