Financial history QUEENS ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH COVENTRY

Charity number: 1127882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £281.38k £219.72k £259.43k £174.31k £170.26k
Total expenditure £271.05k £231.76k £227.33k £173.63k £154.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A