Trustees QUEENS ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH COVENTRY

Charity number: 1127882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev NEIL DAVID MARTIN Chair 11 September 2018
QUEENS ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH, COVENTRY
Recently registered
Ololade Oladapo Olaniyi Trustee 07 April 2024
None on record
Ajayi Toyin Medaiyese Trustee 07 April 2024
QUEENS ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH, COVENTRY
Recently registered
Andrew John Knott Trustee 19 May 2021
QUEENS ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH, COVENTRY
Recently registered
Christine Margaret Headon Trustee 19 May 2021
QUEENS ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH, COVENTRY
Recently registered
Angela Liley Trustee 19 May 2021
QUEENS ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH, COVENTRY
Recently registered
Jonathan James Gilbert White Trustee 19 May 2021
QUEENS ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH, COVENTRY
Recently registered
MIRANDA SHIEH Trustee 12 May 2019
QUEENS ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH, COVENTRY
Recently registered
IAIN JAMES COLVILLE Trustee 13 October 2015
QUEENS ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH, COVENTRY
Recently registered
JUDITH MABEL BRAZIER Trustee 15 March 2011
QUEENS ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH, COVENTRY
Recently registered
ANNA ELIZABETH GRIMSHAW Trustee 15 March 2011
QUEENS ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH, COVENTRY
Recently registered
DAN SIMONDS Trustee 11 March 2003
QUEENS ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH, COVENTRY
Recently registered
CHRIS BURRELL Trustee 10 March 1992
QUEENS ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH, COVENTRY
Recently registered
JAN WILLIAM FISHER Trustee
QUEENS ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH, COVENTRY
Recently registered