Financial history SUUBI AFRICA (UK)

Charity number: 1129595
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £68.43k £47.41k £90.51k £124.57k £100.85k
Total expenditure £109.65k £59.15k £73.22k £122.87k £100.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A