Trustees SUUBI AFRICA (UK)
Charity number: 1129595

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NEVILLE STEPTOE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Carol Watson | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
MIchelle Marie Bellamy | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOSEPH LOW | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marie Elizabeth McQuaid Mrs | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Hill | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Jenkins | Trustee | 02 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL HOGAN | Trustee | 06 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA SALLY POWELL | Trustee | 11 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
KEITH JOHNSON | Trustee | 13 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE STEPTOE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.