Accounts and annual returns MCF- LIFE CHURCH

Charity number: 1130202
Charity reporting is up to date (92 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 31 March 2025 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 31 March 2025 92 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 02 January 2025 371 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 02 January 2025 371 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 27 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 27 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2021 24 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 24 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 27 March 2021 88 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 27 March 2021 88 days late Download Open in new window