Financial history MCF- LIFE CHURCH

Charity number: 1130202
Charity reporting is up to date (92 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £34.14k £29.51k £29.68k £42.02k £40.11k
Total expenditure £33.59k £27.82k £26.96k £40.94k £44.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A