Financial history BANGLADESHI YOUTH ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1129714
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £78.22k £124.80k £265.28k £99.68k £188.79k
Total expenditure £59.26k £92.85k £276.32k £139.36k £156.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £53.00k N/A
Income from government grants N/A £80.00k £120.00k £12.00k £96.71k