TRIDENT REACH THE PEOPLE CHARITY

Charity number: 1129187
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Trident Reach the People Charity is a people first organisation working in partnership to maximise positivity, independence and participation. To support people and communities to exercise choice and control over their own lives and communities; have access to training, education or work-like activities and to live independently and participate as active and equal citizens.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City
  • Coventry City
  • Derbyshire
  • Dudley
  • Sandwell
  • Shropshire
  • Solihull
  • Walsall
  • Wolverhampton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 April 2009: Standard registration
  • 24 January 2025: Funds received from 701931 COTON IN THE ELMS WIDOWS / WIDOWERS AND OLD FOLK A...
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • TRIDENT SPHERE (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bal Kaur Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Jamie Whitmore Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Paul Hayward Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Nick Murphy Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Dr CHRISTOPHER RONALD HANDY Trustee 23 March 2020
None on record
Patrick Martin McCarthy Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Stephen Gabriel Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Yasmin Fearon Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Simon Hatchman Trustee 01 August 2018
THE LINKAGE COMMUNITY TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
YVONNE LEISHMAN Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
Brian Cormack Carr Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
JOHN DAVID MORRIS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.13m £15.04m £15.25m £17.01m £17.19m
Total expenditure £14.12m £14.99m £15.20m £16.95m £17.11m
Income from government contracts £12.55m £14.15m £13.28m £16.05m £16.75m
Income from government grants £218.36k £486.86k £756.58k £944.23k £402.55k
Income - Donations and legacies £3.15k £25.03k £51.61k £1.10k £2.49k
Income - Other trading activities £77.83k £104.01k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £14.05m £14.91m £15.20m £17.01m £17.18m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £13.66k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £14.02m £14.88m £15.20m £16.95m £17.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £7.60k £7.90k £6.50k £7.80k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £292.68k £439.38k £732.63k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £107.89k £106.78k £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £355.89k £296.73k £357.94k £222.85k £141.76k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £2.97m £2.87m £3.42m £4.04m £3.78m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £1.04m £829.06k £1.39m £1.82m £1.40m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 May 2024 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 24 May 2024 114 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
12 Fairlie House
Trident Close
Erdington
Birmingham
West Midlands
B23 5TB
Phone:
01216334633