Financial history THE UK FRIENDS OF THE TRASIMENO MUSIC FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1129653
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £29.70k £18.99k £13.06k £17.99k £18.40k
Total expenditure £22.48k £805 £38.58k £10.84k £31.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A