BISHAM CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church of England church trust for benefit of pupils of village school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 09 March 2010: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev DAVE BULL | Chair | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW STEWART FEATHERSTONE-CLARK | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.00k | £4 | £4 | £4 | £3 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.25k | £3.66k | £0 | £0 | £140 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 196 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 196 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 562 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 562 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 927 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 927 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 November 2020 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5 MARCH 1860
Charitable objects
TO BE APPLIED AS A SITE FOR A SCHOOL FOR POOR PERSONS OF AND IN THE PARISH OF BISHAM AFORESAID AND FOR THE RESIDENCE OF THE SCHOOL MASTER OR SCHOOL MISTRESS OF THE SAID SCHOOL AND FOR OTHER PURPOSES OF THE SAID SCHOOL AND FOR NO OTHER PURPOSES WHATEVER.
Area of benefit
BISHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 Bisham Village
Marlow Road
Bisham
Marlow
SL7 1RR
- Phone:
- 01628471195
- Email:
- stewartclark@compuserve.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window