Financial history MISSION HELPING HANDS

Charity number: 1129956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £16.68k £10.29k £11.34k £9.40k £11.99k
Total expenditure £16.73k £8.83k £10.46k £9.75k £9.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A