Accounts and annual returns THE TANG TING TWINNING FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1130073
Charity reporting is overdue by 76 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 76 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 76 days
Annual return 30 April 2023 07 August 2024 160 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 19 April 2023 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 05 April 2023 401 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 09 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required