Accounts and annual returns PANCHAMUKHEE

Charity number: 1130444
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 3 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 3 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 12 August 2024 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 12 December 2023 226 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 15 June 2022 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 09 November 2021 193 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required