Financial history PANCHAMUKHEE

Charity number: 1130444
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £30.12k £21.89k £4.44k £15.13k £16.86k
Total expenditure £22.46k £21.60k £3.82k £15.62k £13.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A