EDP (EDUCATIONAL DEVELOPMENT PROJECTS) TRUST

Charity Number: 1129398
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Funding the construction, maintenance and operating costs of a secondary school near Accra in Ghana.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £152,223
Total expenditure: £140,549

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire
  • Ghana

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 May 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID ALEXANDER LUNAN Chair
None on record
Charlotte Ruth Robertson Trustee 03 December 2024
None on record
James Lloyd Wilson Trustee 23 October 2024
None on record
Maxwell John Sayers Trustee 25 June 2020
None on record
Nicholas Robertson Trustee 28 September 2015
None on record
INEZ ALICE LUNAN Trustee 19 August 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £412.22k £318.50k £137.97k £140.49k £152.22k
Total expenditure £478.13k £296.62k £140.83k £152.97k £140.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 24 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 24 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 12 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 12 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 29 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 29 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 21 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 21 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 02 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 02 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
135 LITTLE ANN ROAD
LITTLE ANN
ANDOVER
SP11 7NW
Phone:
01264710229
Email:
No information available