ORCHARD BAPTIST FELLOWSHIP, BICESTER
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The church meets weekly at Cooper School with activities for all ages. Many also meet in midweek Home Groups. The church maintains a lively ministry supporting local mission and providing overseas support - food relief for Zimbabwe, support for a childrens home in Goa, and support for the church in China. We run Alpha Courses, Grapevine (Parents & Toddlers) and Ig-nite (Youth Club).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
- Bangladesh
- China
- India
- Sudan
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 14 May 2009: Standard registration
- 16 April 2014: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 16 April 2014: Funds transferred to 1155012 ORCHARD BAPTIST CHURCH
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.91k | £99.02k | £83.39k | £104.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.79k | £58.62k | £69.26k | £74.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 24 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 24 October 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 14 August 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | 14 August 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 22 September 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | 22 September 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ACT OF PARLIAMENT
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window