THE HOUSE OF THE BLESSED MARY THE VIRGIN IN OXFORD, COMMONLY CALLED ORIEL COLLEGE, OF THE FOUNDATION OF EDWARD THE SECOND OF FAMOUS MEMORY SOMETIME KING OF ENGLAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of undergraduate education within the University of Oxford and to promote research and advanced study.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£16,637,000
Donations and legacies | £2.88m | |
Charitable activities | £8.24m | |
Other trading activities | £440.00k | |
Investments | £4.96m | |
Other | £117.00k |
Total expenditure:
£12,308,000
Raising funds | £1.91m | |
Charitable activities | £10.37m | |
Other | £28.00k |
£9,052,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.94m | |
Charitable expenditure | £10.37m | |
Retained for future use | £4.33m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.94m | |
Charitable expenditure | £10.37m | |
Retained for future use | £13.38m |
People

187 Employee(s)
46 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 6 |
£70k to £80k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 18 May 2011: Standard registration
- 25 August 2023: Funds received from 1156439 THE SIR MICHAEL MCWILLIAM FOUNDATION
- ORIEL COLLEGE (Working name)
- THE PROVOST AND SCHOLARS OF THE HOUSE OF THE BLESSED MARY THE VIRGIN IN OXFORD COMMONLY CALLED ORIEL COLLEGE OF THE FOUNDATION OF EDWARD THE SECOND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
46 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Thomas Luke Johnson | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Dominic Alonzi | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bernadette Young | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Olivia Elder | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marco Zhang | Trustee | 02 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Cecile Bishop | Trustee | 03 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Jones Mrs | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tim Elliot | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Maw | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sumana Sunyal | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicholas Gaskill | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Robert Wainwright | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Wynn | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Neil Mendoza | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr Julien Devriendt | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Wells | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Victor Mattellan | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Patrick Farrell | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Luca Castagnoli | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Prof Hindy Najman | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Teresa Bejan | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Justin Coon | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
PROF LYNDAL ROPER | Trustee | 27 May 2013 |
|
|||||
Dr PAUL YOWELL | Trustee | 21 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN MURPHY | Trustee | 17 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Prof MICHAEL PETER DEVEREUX | Trustee | 17 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ARMOUR | Trustee | 17 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
LYNNE COX | Trustee | 17 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
IAN HORROCKS | Trustee | 17 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
JULIANE KERKHECKER | Trustee | 17 May 2011 |
|
|||||
Sandra Robertson | Trustee | 17 May 2011 |
|
|||||
Dr MUNGO WILSON | Trustee | 17 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW BOOTHROYD | Trustee | 17 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
YADVINDER MALHI | Trustee | 17 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
BRUNO CURRIE | Trustee | 17 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
LARS FUGGER | Trustee | 17 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr OLIVER POOLEY | Trustee | 17 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
JULIA MANNHERZ | Trustee | 17 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
GONZALO RODRIGUEZ-PEREYRA | Trustee | 17 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM WOOD | Trustee | 17 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HODGSON | Trustee | 17 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANNETTE VOLFING | Trustee | 17 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
JAMES FRANK SPARKS | Trustee | 17 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HUBER | Trustee | 17 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER BOWDLER | Trustee | 17 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
YAKOV KREMNITZER | Trustee | 17 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.27m | £6.58m | £12.63m | £11.90m | £11.87m | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.45m | £18.58m | £14.11m | £12.42m | £12.31m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.95m | £1.92m | £2.33m | £3.32m | £2.88m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £165.00k | £38.00k | £351.00k | £975.00k | £440.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.67m | £4.31m | £6.09m | £7.14m | £8.24m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £1.65m | £510.00k | £1.02m | £736.00k | £635.00k | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.67m | £3.98m | £3.74m | £4.28m | £4.96m | |
|
Income - Other | £477.00k | £315.00k | £115.00k | £98.00k | £117.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £25.00k | £15.00k | £103.00k | £61.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £9.82m | £9.90m | £12.60m | £10.20m | £10.37m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.58m | £1.78m | £1.49m | £2.02m | £1.91m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £47.00k | £34.00k | £37.00k | £57.00k | £740.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £1.09m | £1.26m | £1.05m | £1.38m | £1.31m | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £45.00k | £6.89m | £21.00k | £204.00k | £28.00k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £13.72m | £19.30m | £19.44m | £21.13m | £23.19m | |
|
Long-term investments | £104.89m | £127.04m | £126.48m | £127.32m | £132.87m | |
|
Other assets | £2.42m | £3.34m | £4.47m | £9.00m | £13.14m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£1.40m | -£1.30m | -£3.57m | -£2.03m | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £14.02m | £37.57m | £36.67m | £37.27m | £37.65m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 06 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 06 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 22 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 22 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
FOUNDING DOCUMENT OF 21 JANUARY 1326 AND STATUTES LAST AMENDED 1 APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
A COLLEGE OF SCHOLARS STUDYING SACRED THEOLOGY, CIVIL AND CANON LAW AND USEFUL KNOWLEDGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ORIEL COLLEGE
ORIEL SQUARE
OXFORD
OX1 4EW
- Phone:
- 01865276555
- Email:
- LODGE@ORIEL.OX.AC.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window