Financial history THE PRINCIPAL AND FELLOWS OF THE MANCHESTER ACADEMY AND HARRIS COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD

Charity Number: 1143086
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £3.32m £4.85m £6.58m £5.62m £6.43m
Total expenditure £4.19m £4.41m £5.07m £5.27m £4.68m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £390.31k £47.44k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £929.00k £2.30m £4.24m £1.85m £2.03m
Income - Other trading activities £2.00k £4.00k £2.94k £2.00k £3.92k
Income - Charitable activities £1.74m £1.72m £2.51m £2.77m £3.47m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £820.00k £0 £0
Income - Investment £463.00k £601.00k £615.59k £804.00k £916.04k
Income - Other £182.00k £228.00k £28.22k £188.00k £8.35k
Income - Legacies £0 £44.23k £1.76m £36.32k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.07m £4.22m £4.97m £5.15m £4.49m
Expenditure - Raising funds £122.00k £184.00k £99.00k £122.00k £188.46k
Expenditure - Governance £108.00k £93.00k £18.00k £25.00k £32.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £9.00k £9.39k
Expenditure - Investment management £6.00k £9.00k £5.00k £4.00k £6.44k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0