DEVON AND CORNWALL REFUGEE SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide 1 advice and support to asylum seekers and refugees in Devon and Cornwall 2 Signposting to solicitors to conduct AS appeals 3 Free food parcels to destitute ASRs 4 Free clothing 5 Internet suite 6 A social meeting place for ASRs 7 Arranging English and other courses 8 Talks to educate public in ASR issues 9 Activities to promote health and fitness among ASRs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
- Devon
Governance
- 25 June 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lenka Reznik-Zelenkova | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Asrar Bashir | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Edward Charles Lees | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Azeb Mengisteab | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sana Murrani | Trustee | 31 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Eccleston | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
JANE BARKES | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Stephens | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alana Hunter | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Peter Gasper | Trustee | 19 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £157.24k | £188.82k | £307.08k | £218.51k | £466.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £176.21k | £187.11k | £239.96k | £215.54k | £329.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 JUNE 2007 NOW ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 30 NOVEMBER 2010. as amended on 29 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
5.1 TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO REFUGEES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS LIVING IN DEVON AND CORNWALL WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS 5.2 TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF REFUGEES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS RESIDENT IN DEVON AND CORNWALL 5.3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF REFUGEES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS RESIDENT IN DEVON AND CORNWALL IN NEED THEREOF SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST IN THEIR REHABILITATION WITHIN A NEW COMMUNITY 5.4 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ABOUT THE ISSUES RELATING TO REFUGEES 5.5 TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF REFUGEES RESIDING IN DEVON AND CORNWALL AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH
Area of benefit
DEVON AND CORNWALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
DEVON & CORNWALL REFUGEE SUPPORT
7 WHIMPLE STREET
PLYMOUTH
PL1 2DH
- Phone:
- 01752265952
- Email:
- hub@dcrs-plymouth.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window