IRIS THEATRE

Charity number: 1132295
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The furtherance of the promotion of performing arts education, especially amongst young adults through theatrical productions.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £15,589
Total expenditure: £5,923

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Croydon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 October 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sophie Morgan Berenger Chair 15 October 2018
None on record
Kris Milovsorov Trustee 30 September 2020
OPEN DOOR PEOPLE
Received: 39 days late
Dr Daniel Winder Trustee 05 October 2019
None on record
Mohit Pasricha Trustee 28 November 2017
None on record
Ine Van Riet Trustee 01 July 2017
None on record
CHARLES GRANT Trustee
THE CHOPIN SOCIETY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £172.95k £63.53k £179.80k £112.88k £15.59k
Total expenditure £168.27k £65.96k £170.07k £145.40k £5.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £59.55k £19.48k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 02 July 2024 245 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 02 July 2024 245 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
STANLEY ARTS
12 SOUTH NORWOOD HILL
LONDON
SE25 6AB
Phone:
02078365221