THE MID SUSSEX ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity Number: 1131150
Charity reporting is up to date (74 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To benefit the residents of Mid Sussex and the neighbourhood and in particular Muslim residents and to advance religion in accordance with the tenets and doctrines of Islam.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £37,817
Total expenditure: £40,615

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 August 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANWAR HUSSAIN CHOWDHURY Chair
None on record
Shamsul Haque Trustee 11 August 2022
None on record
NOORUL ISLAM Trustee
None on record
TOFOJJUL HUSSAIN Trustee
SIDNEY WEST CENTRE CHARITY
Received: On time
MOHAMMED BASHAR Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £37.45k £39.21k £35.42k £37.69k £37.82k
Total expenditure £37.51k £28.85k £28.24k £40.09k £40.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.29k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 13 August 2024 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 13 August 2024 74 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 02 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 02 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 25 July 2022 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 25 July 2022 55 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 24 June 2021 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 24 June 2021 24 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 03 August 2020 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 03 August 2020 64 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST EDMUNDS HALL
WIVELSFIELD ROAD
HAYWARDS HEATH
RH16 4EQ
Phone:
014444 628909
Website:

No information available