BANGLADESH ASSOCIATION AND COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BACP exists to promote the welfare of the deprived and disadvantaged communities within Rochdale through: - vocational training,IT, Employability courses - welfare, advice & support services - day care centre for the BME elders - gender specific gym facilities - engaging children, young people & women in positive pursuits - language school for the children - community cohesion activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £15,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Rochdale
Governance
- 22 September 2010: Standard registration
- 12 November 2012: Funds received from 1059753 THE BANGLADESH ASSOCIATION AND COMMUNITY PROJECT
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR RAHMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Musharraf Hussain | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Azm Mahbubul Anam Khan | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fardausi Chowdhury | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
SYED JAMAL HUSSAIN | Trustee | 30 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
FARUK ALI | Trustee | 30 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
FOZOR ALI | Trustee | 30 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
SAKON MIAH | Trustee | 30 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
SYED SORKUM ISLAM | Trustee | 30 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUHEL MIAH | Trustee | 03 July 2012 |
|
|||||
SHEK MD KOYRUL ALAM | Trustee | 03 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
ISLAM SAIFUL SIDDIQUE | Trustee | 03 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
MR BASITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR KALAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.42k | £79.72k | £57.71k | £289.35k | £410.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.20k | £40.87k | £61.54k | £234.14k | £395.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.75k | £53.33k | £28.06k | £15.00k | £15.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/06/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/06/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/05/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/03/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE IN HABITANTS AND PRIMARILY THE BANGLADESHI IN HABITANTS OF THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF ROCHDALE (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO: (I) ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE SAID IN HABITANTS; (II) RELIEVE NEED BY THE PROVISION OF AN ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT SERVICE; (III) PROMOTE GOOD RACE RELATIONS BETWEEN THE PERSONS OF ENGLAND AND BANGLADESH BY ENDEAVOURING TO ELIMINATE DISCRIMINATION ON GROUNDS OF RACE AND ENCOURAGING EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS.
Area of benefit
ROCHDALE
Contact information
- Address:
-
108 RAMSAY STREET
ROCHDALE
OL16 2EZ
- Phone:
- 01706860349
- Email:
- info@bacprochdale.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window