Financial history ROBINSON COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1137494
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £9.28m £8.16m £9.09m £10.01m £11.76m
Total expenditure £11.12m £10.18m £11.55m £12.16m £12.97m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.08m £1.10m £1.38m £913.00k £2.12m
Income - Other trading activities £1.41m £6.00k £613.00k £1.23m £1.64m
Income - Charitable activities £5.54m £5.46m £6.43m £6.79m £6.96m
Income - Endowments £102.00k £240.00k £96.00k £37.00k £178.40k
Income - Investment £1.06m £923.00k £660.00k £1.08m £1.19m
Income - Other £302.00k £427.00k £104.00k £30.00k £29.94k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £100.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.56m £8.68m £9.90m £9.86m £10.25m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.57m £1.50m £1.65m £2.30m £2.73m
Expenditure - Governance £22.00k £25.00k £25.00k £34.00k £46.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £791.00k £784.00k £825.00k £947.00k £1.03m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0