ANNO'S AFRICA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To offer an alternative arts education to orphans and vulnerable children in Kenya's most deprived city slums. We link up with charity schools and orphanages to provide workshops in Music, Dance (inluding Ballet), Art, Drama and Circus. We now also provide the aforementioned workshops in Malawi in addition to Kenya.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kenya
- Malawi
Governance
- 16 September 2009: Standard registration
- 12 May 2023: Funds received from 1064331 WONDERFUL BEAST COMPANY
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW TIMOTHY BIRKIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Susan Frederica Chandler | Trustee | 23 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lia Craig | Trustee | 05 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Hamilton | Trustee | 13 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Owen Richard Lewis | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALLAN DAVID CORDUNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CATHERINE ANN NYGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HAYLEY CATHERINE ROSE VIVIEN MILLS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.80k | £32.71k | £30.05k | £36.70k | £44.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.03k | £33.18k | £35.49k | £40.55k | £42.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 December 2021 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 December 2021 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 JULY 2009
Charitable objects
THE DIRECTORS SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN AFRICA, NAMELY:- TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE (WHO REQUIRE BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES) THROUGH: A THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL ARTISTIC AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE INDEPENDENT AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; C) THROUGH ADVANCING EDUCATION. ( 3 ) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: BY PREVENTING THEM FROM 'BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
AFRICA,
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ty Hwnt I'R Gors
Llannor
PWLLHELI
LL53 8PX
- Phone:
- 02079376176
- Email:
- bee@annosafrica.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window