Accounts and annual returns HALABJA COMMUNITY PLAY PROJECT

Charity number: 1132672
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 26 March 2025 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2023 26 March 2025 419 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2022 26 March 2025 784 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2021 25 March 2025 1148 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1548 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1548 days